FL S1406 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "athletics personnel"; requiring an entity that administers or conducts a high-risk youth athletic activity or related training on certain property to require unpaid or volunteer athletics personnel to complete a specified course; requiring such personnel to complete the course within a specified timeframe after their initial involvement, and annually thereafter, etc.
Title
Youth Athletic Activities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/11/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H99 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Quality Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1406 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1406/BillText/Filed/HTML |