FL S1428 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting a candidate, or the candidate's spouse, parent, child, or sibling, from serving as a principal of a charitable organization that receives surplus funds or from receiving a direct financial benefit from such organization in exchange for the donation of surplus funds, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disposition of Surplus Funds by Candidates

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Rules
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-04-02SenateNow in Rules
2019-04-02SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-28SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 04/02/19, 10:00 am, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-26SenateCS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time
2019-03-25SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2019-03-21SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-20SenateCS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-03-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/20/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-03-04SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-02-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H533 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
106141Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback