FL S1436 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1045 (Ch. 2019-154)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1045 (Ch. 2019-154)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the Department of Health from establishing a minimum amount or a maximum amount for Closing the Gap grants; requiring that the amount of each award be based on the merits of each application and that grants be awarded to applicants in various regions of the state; adding a priority area that may be addressed in a Closing the Gap grant proposal, etc.
Title
Closing the Gap Grant Proposals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1045 (Ch. 2019-154) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Substituted HB 1045 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/19 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-11 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-08 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/11/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/04/19, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/25/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1045 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-154
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
381 | 7354 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
381 | 7355 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |