FL S1440 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 945
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Children and Families and the Agency for Health Care Administration to identify certain children and adolescents who use crisis stabilization services during specified fiscal years; including crisis response services provided through mobile response teams in the array of services available to children and adolescents; requiring managing entities to develop a plan promoting the development of a coordinated system of care for certain services; requiring the agency to conduct, or contract for, the testing of provider network databases maintained by Medicaid managed care plans for specified purposes, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children's Mental Health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 945
2020-03-11SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 945
2020-03-11SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/20
2020-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-05SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-03-05SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-03-03SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2020-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-19SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-02-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/18/20, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-10SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2020-02-06SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2020-02-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-04SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2020-01-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/04/20, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2020-01-06SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H945 (Same As) 2020-06-29 - Chapter No. 2020-107
H7065 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100444Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394493Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944955Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3949082Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409967Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409988Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985601Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback