FL S1456 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a fee for a certain specialty license plate, etc.
Title
Specialty License Plate Fees/Highwaymen
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/03/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S1454 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
H387 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-176, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1135 (Ch. 2020-181)
H385 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
H1135 (Similar To) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-181, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 387 (Ch. 2020-176)
H387 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-176, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 1135 (Ch. 2020-181)
H385 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Transportation and Infrastructure Subcommittee
H1135 (Similar To) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-181, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 387 (Ch. 2020-176)