FL S1460 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-135
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Chapter No. 2019-135
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the criteria for hospitals to be included on the state list of stroke centers by the Agency for Health Care Administration; revising provisions relating to the statewide stroke registry to conform to changes made by the act; revising provisions prohibiting the advertisement of a hospital as a state-listed stroke center, unless certain conditions are met, to conform to changes made by the act, etc.
Title
Stroke Centers
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Health Policy Committee | Sen. Lauren Book [D] | Sen. Bobby Powell [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-01 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#338 (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#24 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-26 | Chapter No. 2019-135 | |
2019-06-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-06-14 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2019-05-01 | House | CS passed; YEAS 114 NAYS 0 |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-30 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-30 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | House | Received |
2019-04-29 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/19 |
2019-04-29 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2019-04-25 | House | In Messages |
2019-04-25 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/25/19 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/09/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/04/19, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered |
2019-03-21 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-18 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/18/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H993 (Same As) 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/SB 1460 (Ch. 2019-135)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
395 | 3038 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 30381 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 3039 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
395 | 3041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |