FL S1470 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring health care practitioners to obtain written informed consent from the patient or the patient's legal representative in order to perform examinations on or provide medical care or treatment to the patient, with exceptions; requiring the attending health care practitioner to inform the patient of specified information and to document specified information in the patient's medical record under certain circumstances; providing for disciplinary action against attending health care practitioners or supervising medical educators who fail to comply with certain provisions, etc.
Title
Informed Consent
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-26 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/18/20, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Filed |