FL S1472 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Governor to require the improvement of inadequate communications systems or the specific placement of towers under certain circumstances; requiring a local government to reimburse the state for such costs under certain circumstances; providing factors that the Division of State Technology within the Department of Management Services may consider to find that a community's communications system is inadequate, etc.
Title
Public Safety Communications Systems
Sponsors
Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Community Affairs; Appropriations |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1472 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1472/BillText/Filed/HTML |