FL S1480 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing amendments to the State Constitution to limit the terms of office for a member of a district school board, etc.
Title
Limitation on Terms of Office for Members of a District School Board
Sponsors
Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Education; Rules |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1480 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1480/BillText/Filed/HTML |