FL S1482 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-26 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1087
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the duties of the Department of Children and Families in relation to the domestic violence program; repealing a provision relating to the duties and functions of the Florida Coalition Against Domestic Violence with respect to domestic violence; revising the requirements of domestic violence centers; removing the coalition from the capital improvement grant program process, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic Violence Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-26SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1087
2020-02-26SenateSubstituted CS/HB 1087
2020-02-26SenateRead 2nd time
2020-02-19SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-02-19SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 02/19/20
2020-02-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-19SenateWithdrawn from Appropriations
2020-02-17SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-13SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2020-02-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/13/20, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-31SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2020-01-29SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
2020-01-29SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-28SenateCS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2020-01-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/28/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2020-01-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1087 (Same As) 2020-02-28 - Chapter No. 2020-6

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1004615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
381006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3810072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
398296Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39902Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39903Amended CodeSee Bill Text
399035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39904Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
399055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40240Amended CodeSee Bill Text
741316Amended CodeSee Bill Text
75303Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9431701Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback