FL S1494 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 6017 (Ch. 2019-157)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 6017 (Ch. 2019-157)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removing the acreage limitations that apply to small-scale comprehensive plan amendments, etc.
Title
Small-scale Comprehensive Plan Amendments
Sponsors
Sen. Keith Perry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 6017 (Ch. 2019-157) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Substituted HB 6017 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/19 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-18 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/23/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Favorable by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 04/09/19, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Now in Infrastructure and Security |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/26/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Infrastructure and Security; Rules |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6017 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-157
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1494 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1494/BillText/Filed/HTML |