FL S1498 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting physicians who provide a certain number of hours of pro bono services from continuing education requirements; establishing a registration program for volunteer retired physicians; revising the physician licensure criteria applicable to Canadian applicants; establishing a registration program for volunteer retired osteopathic physicians, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Access to Health Care Practitioner Services

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-02-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1157 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
456013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458310Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4583105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
458319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45900751Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45900752Amended CodeSee Bill Text
459008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7661115Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback