FL S1502 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing an amendment to the State Constitution to require the Chief Financial Officer, as prescribed by general law, to annually provide information about counties and municipalities to residents in a manner that allows residents to compare economic and noneconomic factors of each local government, etc.
Title
Information About Counties and Municipalities
Sponsors
Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/17/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7061 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1502 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1502/BillText/Filed/HTML |