FL S1506 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the commercial use or distribution of law enforcement photographs, images, or video recordings of a deceased person or that show a person's extreme, severe, or acute injuries, which photographs, images, or video recordings are confidential and exempt from public records laws. Provides criminal penalties. Provides that these provisions shall not be construed to prohibit constitutionally protected acts, etc.
Title
Law Enforcement Photographs & Video Recordings/Use [SPSC]
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Criminal Justice | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations -SJ 00106 | |
2010-02-03 | Referred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Criminal and Civil Justice Appropriations | |
2010-01-27 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0649 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
S1496 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
H0647 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)
S1496 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Criminal Justice
H0647 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Governmental Affairs Policy (EDCA)