FL S1506 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Education to establish the pilot program; providing requirements for the pilot program; providing an implementation schedule for the pilot program, etc.
Title
Pilot Program for Improving Low-performing Schools
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Education |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1205 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in K-12 Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1506 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2014/1506/BillText/Filed/HTML |