FL S1506 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deleting a requirement that a district school board conduct a cost-benefit analysis before voting on a resolution to implement one or more exceptions to the educational facilities construction requirements, etc.
Title
Education
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Lee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H6071 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Quality Subcommittee, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
S7070 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Chapter No. 2019-23
S7070 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Chapter No. 2019-23
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1506 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1506/BillText/Filed/HTML |