FL S1506 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing a public records exemption to include the expunction of specified convictions of certain persons convicted of driving while license suspended, revoked, canceled, or disqualified; providing for legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Expunction of Specified Convictions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-10SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2020-02-06SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2020-02-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-04SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-01-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/04/20, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations
2020-01-07SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1504 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9430587Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback