FL S1508 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-62
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - Chapter No. 2020-62
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from knowingly selling, exchanging, or transferring a police vehicle without removing any police markings from the vehicle; requiring law enforcement agencies to provide an official letter of notification that the police markings have been removed; exempting sales, exchanges, or transfers of police vehicles to members of the public for the purposes of collection or display from specified requirements, etc.
Title
Police Vehicles
Sponsors
Senate Infrastructure and Security Committee | Senate Criminal Justice Committee | Sen. Annette Taddeo [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#733 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#35 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#35 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Chapter No. 2020-62 | |
2020-06-20 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-11 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | House | CS passed; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20 |
2020-03-09 | House | Received |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-03-09 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-19 | Senate | CS/CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | CS/CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 02/17/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-12 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Now in Infrastructure and Security |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/20, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice; Infrastructure and Security; Rules |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1281 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/SB 1508 passed