FL S1516 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1187
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that it is a felony for certain persons who are infected with human immunodeficiency virus to donate blood, plasma, organs, skin, or other human tissue for use in another person, with an exception; requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to adopt by rule specified minimum standards for certain organ transplants; prohibiting a health insurance policy from limiting or excluding coverage solely on the basis that an insured is a living organ donor; prohibiting an organ procurement organization from charging a deceased donor or his or her family member any fee for services relating to the procurement or donation of organs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Organ Donation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1187
2020-03-10SenateSubstituted CS/HB 1187
2020-03-10SenateAmendment(s) adopted (176106, 225426)
2020-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-09SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-06SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-02SenateCS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
2020-02-27SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-26SenateCS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 0
2020-02-21SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-13SenateCS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time
2020-02-13SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-13SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-11SenateCS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2020-02-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/11/20, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-31SenateNow in Judiciary
2020-01-29SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2020-01-29SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-28SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2020-01-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/28/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2020-01-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1187 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
H427 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S626 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
H1143 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3810041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409815Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276045Amended CodeSee Bill Text
765514Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7655155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
765517Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7655175Amended CodeSee Bill Text
76553Amended CodeSee Bill Text
765543Amended CodeSee Bill Text
765548Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback