FL S1518 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 501 (Ch. 2019-148)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 501 (Ch. 2019-148)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Veterans' Affairs, subject to appropriation, to contract with a state university or Florida College System institution to furnish specified alternative treatment options for certain veterans; providing requirements as to the provision of alternative treatment options and related assessment data; specifying eligibility to receive alternative treatment, etc.
Title
Alternative Treatment Options for Veterans
Sponsors
Senate Appropriations Committee | Senate Health Policy Committee | Sen. Tommy Wright [R] | Sen. Lauren Book [D] |
Sen. Janet Cruz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 501 (Ch. 2019-148) |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 501 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/19 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-04-22 | Senate | CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-18 | Senate | CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-15 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/09/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-04-03 | Senate | CS by Health Policy read 1st time |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 04/01/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H501 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Chapter No. 2019-148