FL S1518 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Community Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that the Consultants' Competitive Negotiation Act may not be construed to prevent cooperative purchasing between governmental agencies if certain criteria are met, etc.
Title
Acquisition of Certain Professional Services
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Community Affairs |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H257 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1518 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1518/BillText/Filed/HTML |