FL S1528 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging the Department of Homeland Security to create the Haitian Family Reunification Parole Program, etc.
Title
Haitian Family Reunification Parole Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Messages | |
2012-02-14 | In Messages | |
2012-02-13 | Adopted -SJ 496 | |
2012-02-13 | Read 2nd time -SJ 496 | |
2012-02-09 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/13/12 | |
2012-02-02 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 325 | |
2012-02-01 | Favorable by- Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 -SJ 325 | |
2012-01-27 | On Committee agenda-- Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/01/12, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced -SJ 217 | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Military Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security -SJ 217 | |
2012-01-06 | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1528 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1528/BillText/Filed/HTML |