FL S1528 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 19
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Agency for Health Care Administration to establish the Canadian Prescription Drug Importation Program; requiring the agency to contract with a vendor to facilitate wholesale prescription drug importation under the program; providing eligibility criteria for prescription drugs, Canadian suppliers, and importers under the program; authorizing a Canadian supplier to export drugs into this state under the program under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription Drug Importation Programs

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/HB 19
2019-04-26SenateSubstituted CS/HB 19
2019-04-26SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/19
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-22SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2019-04-19SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-04-18SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 14 NAYS 4
2019-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-11SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/09/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 04/04/19, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2019-04-02SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2019-03-27SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2019-03-27SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2019-03-25SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 8 NAYS 2
2019-03-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/25/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-02-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H19 (Similar To) 2019-06-11 - Chapter No. 2019-99
S1452 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H7073 (Similar To) 2019-06-27 - Vetoed by Governor

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38102035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4650157Amended CodeSee Bill Text
465017Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4990051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
49901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4990285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
499065Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback