FL S1538 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Florida Integrity Office under the Auditor General; providing for the appointment of the Florida Integrity Officer; providing procedures for the submission and investigation of certain complaints; authorizing the Florida Integrity Officer to take certain action in response to complaints received; revising provisions relating to contractual services and commodities that are not subject to competitive-solicitation requirements; requiring the Office of Inspector General of the Department of Education to conduct investigations relating to waste, fraud, abuse, or mismanagement against a district school board or Florida College System institution, etc.
Title
Government Integrity
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Ethics and Elections; Rules |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1111 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 1245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3187 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3188 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3189 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 31895 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 325 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 00001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1538 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1538/BillText/Filed/HTML |