FL S1540 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a court to order a defendant arrested for an act of domestic violence not to possess firearms or ammunition as a condition of bail under certain circumstances; requiring the Department of Law Enforcement, upon receipt of a request for a criminal history record check, to review available records to determine if a potential firearm buyer or transferee has been charged with a crime of domestic violence or has an outstanding warrant issued for an act of domestic violence and is prohibited from possessing firearms or ammunition, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Domestic Violence

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Infrastructure and Security
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Criminal Justice; Rules
2020-01-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1243 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4936108Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7412901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79006Amended CodeSee Bill Text
790065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
90102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430583Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback