FL S1542 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Florida Accountability Office under the Auditor General; providing investigative duties of the Chief Inspector General and agency inspectors general; providing requirements for awards given to employees who report under the Whistle-blower's Act; prohibiting tax incentives from being awarded or paid to a state contractor or subcontractor, etc.
Title
Government Integrity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1047 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in State Affairs Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1001 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1001 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
11 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
110 | 1245 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3187 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3188 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 3189 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
112 | 31895 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
14 | 32 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
17 | 325 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
286 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
287 | 057 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
288 | 00001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1542 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1542/BillText/Filed/HTML |