FL S1546 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Reducing the minimum SAT and ACT scores required for certain students to be eligible for a Florida Academic Scholars award or a Florida Medallion Scholars award; increasing the minimum weighted grade point average required for certain students to be eligible for a Florida Academic Scholars award or a Florida Medallion Scholars award, etc.
Title
Florida Bright Futures Scholarship Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Died in Education Pre-K - 12 |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1275 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died in Higher Education and Workforce Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1009 | 531 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 534 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1009 | 535 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1546 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1546/BillText/Filed/HTML |