FL S1546 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting all aircraft sales and leases, rather than the sales and leases of certain aircraft, from the sales and use tax, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and Use Tax on Aircraft

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations
2020-01-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H6067 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Ways and Means Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback