FL S1552 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - CS combines this bill with SB 2210 -SJ 00525; CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00525; Original bill laid on Table, refer to combined CS/CS/SB 2210 (Laid on Table in Senate) -SJ 00525
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

(THIS BILL COMBINED IN CS/S2210 & 1552) Requires the Florida Real Estate Appraisal Board to adopt certain rules. Requires application, registration, and renewal fees for appraisal management companies. Requires such companies to register with the DBPR. Requires the fingerprinting and criminal history records checks of, and provides qualifications for, certain persons who control appraisal management companies, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appraisers & Appraisal Management Companies [CPSC]

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-07 CS combines this bill with SB 2210 -SJ 00525; CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 00525; Original bill laid on Table, refer to combined CS/CS/SB 2210 (Laid on Table in Senate) -SJ 00525
2010-04-01 On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 04/07/10, 10:15 am, 110-S
2010-03-02 Introduced, referred to Regulated Industries; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; General Government Appropriations -SJ 00109
2010-02-10 Referred to Regulated Industries; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; General Government Appropriations
2010-01-29 Filed

Same As/Similar To

H0303 (Similar To) 2010-05-14 - Approved by Governor; Chapter No. 2010-84
S2210 (Similar To) 2010-04-27 - Read 3rd time -SJ 00883; Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 303 -SJ 00883; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 303 (Ch. 2010-84) -SJ 00883

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
0475611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0475614Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04756147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
04756235New CodeSee Bill Text
0475624Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0475626Amended CodeSee Bill Text
0475629Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback