FL S1552 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing parents of public school students to seek private educational choice options through the Florida Personal Learning Scholarship Accounts Program under certain circumstances; requiring each district school board to allow a parent to enroll his or her child in and transport his or her child to any public school that has not reached capacity in the district; providing an exception to the prohibition on a high-performing charter school establishing more than one charter school in this state under specified circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Student Choice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-01SenateDied on Calendar
2015-04-30SenateRetained on Calendar
2015-04-27SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/30/15
2015-04-24SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2015-04-23SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2015-04-23SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-04-21SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 14 NAYS 4
2015-04-16SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/21/15, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2015-04-06SenateNow in Appropriations
2015-04-02SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 2
2015-03-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 04/02/15, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2015-03-23SenateCS by Education Pre-K - 12 read 1st time
2015-03-23SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
2015-03-20SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2015-03-18SenateCS by Education Pre-K - 12; YEAS 7 NAYS 4
2015-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/18/15, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2015-03-11SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 03/11/15, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Discussed/Workshop
2015-03-03SenateIntroduced
2015-03-03SenateReferred to Education Pre-K - 12; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2015-02-27SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1145 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
S1448 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
H0357 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
H7037 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
S0638 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
S0692 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
S0720 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
S0906 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
S0952 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
S1036 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
S2508 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died on Calendar
H1045 (Similar To) 2015-04-28 - Died on Calendar
H7057 (Similar To) 2015-05-01 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100220Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100231Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002331Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002332Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002451Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10033101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100357Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10035711Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10046491Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101161Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10116202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101164Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101169Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101228Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101242Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012986Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101362Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1552
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1552/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1552/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1552/BillText/c2/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1552/Amendment/813860/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1552/Amendment/791146/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1552/Amendment/445608/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1552/Amendment/517528/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1552/Amendment/501414/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1552/Amendment/962196/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1552/Amendment/828762/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1552/Amendment/169174/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1552/Amendment/160388/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1552/Amendment/398996/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1552/Amendment/917562/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1552/Amendment/446720/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1552/Amendment/368034/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1552/Amendment/472326/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1552/Amendment/715208/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2015/1552/Amendment/735782/HTML

Bill Comments

feedback