FL S1552 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Died in Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a toll facility to ensure the presence of signage notifying drivers if cash payment is not an option; authorizing a rental car company to charge a renter an amount in addition to the toll charge incurred by the renter under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tolls

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11SenateDied in Transportation
2016-01-14SenateIntroduced
2016-01-14SenateReferred to Transportation; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Fiscal Policy
2016-01-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1119 (Same As) 2016-03-11 - Died in Transportation and Economic Development Appropriations Subcommittee
S1392 (Similar To) 2016-03-10 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7027 (Ch. 2016-181), CS/CS/HB 7061 (Ch. 2016-239)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
338155Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338163Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback