FL S1552 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revising provisions relating to school improvements plans; revising the criteria a charter school must meet to require corrective action; creating the Florida Best and Brightest Teacher and Principal Scholar Award Program to be administered by the Department of Education, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

K-12 Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateDied on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
2017-05-05SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-05-04SenateOriginal reference(s) removed: Rules
2017-04-27SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2017-04-27SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-04-25SenateCS/CS by Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2017-04-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2017-04-20SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-04-18SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-04-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education, 04/18/17, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2017-04-06SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education
2017-04-05SenateCS by Education read 1st time
2017-04-04SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-04-03SenateCS by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2017-03-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 04/03/17, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2017-03-15SenateIntroduced
2017-03-14SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Pre-K - 12 Education; Appropriations; Rules
2017-03-02SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1410 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
H7069 (Similar To) 2017-06-16 - Chapter No. 2017-116, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/CS/HB 15 (Ch. 2017-166), CS/CS/HB 293 (Ch. 2017-55), CS/CS/HB 989 (Ch. 2017-177), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70)
H5003 (Similar To) 2017-04-13 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116), SB 2500 (Ch. 2017-70), SB 2502 (Ch. 2017-71), SB 2508 (Ch. 2017-127)
S656 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7069 (Ch. 2017-116)
H5105 (Similar To) 2017-05-08 - See CS/HB 7069

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100142Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100233Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002332Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100833Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1008345Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012732Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback