FL S1552 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Chapter No. 2018-86
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Allowing the Department of Highway Safety and Motor Vehicles to distribute proceeds from the Invest in Children license plate annual use fee on a statewide basis; deleting provisions authorizing the Department of Juvenile Justice to develop evening reporting centers; requiring the department to hold a prolific juvenile offender in secure detention pending a detention hearing following a violation of nonsecure detention, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Justice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#63 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#818 (Y: 77 N: 37 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#817 (Y: 73 N: 41 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#29 (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26 Chapter No. 2018-86
2018-03-23 Approved by Governor
2018-03-16 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2018-03-09SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2018-03-09SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2018-03-09SenateConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (516173) 1041
2018-03-05SenateIn returning messages
2018-03-05HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 77 NAYS 37
2018-03-05HouseRead 3rd time
2018-03-05HouseAmendment(s) adopted (516173)
2018-03-05HouseRead 2nd time 905
2018-03-05HouseSubstituted for CS/HB 1417
2018-03-04HouseReceived 844
2018-03-04HouseReferred to Calendar
2018-03-02HouseIn Messages
2018-03-02SenateCS passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 1
2018-03-02SenateRead 3rd time
2018-03-01SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2018-03-01SenateRead 2nd time
2018-02-27SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/18
2018-02-26SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2018-02-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2018-02-23SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2018-02-22SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 1
2018-02-19SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/22/18, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-02-15SenateNow in Appropriations
2018-02-14SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2018-02-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/14/18, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-02-06SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2018-02-06SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 1
2018-02-01SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/06/18, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Office Building
2018-01-17SenateIntroduced
2018-01-12SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2018-01-04SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H195 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H509 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
S288 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S392 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
S936 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
S1298 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Criminal Justice
H1417 (Similar To) 2018-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 1552
H1359 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died on Calendar
S942 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Messages
H1287 (Similar To) 2018-03-10 - Died in Transportation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
32008058Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98503Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985037Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985039Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98513Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98524Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98525Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98526Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985433Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985439Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985556Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985557Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985565Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985601Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985672Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1552
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1552/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1552/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1552/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1552/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1552/Amendment/378810/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1552/Amendment/659892/HTML
Amendmenthttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1552/Amendment/516173/PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1552/Vote/SenateVote_s01552c1029.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1552/Vote/HouseVote_s01552c1817.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1552/Vote/HouseVote_s01552c1818.PDF
Roll Callhttp://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1552/Vote/SenateVote_s01552c1063.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback