FL S1552 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Chapter No. 2019-114
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the Florida Red Tide Mitigation and Technology Development Initiative; requiring the initiative to submit an annual report by a specified date to the Governor, the Legislature, the Secretary of Environmental Protection, and the executive director of the Fish and Wildlife Conservation Commission; establishing the Initiative Technology Advisory Council, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Florida Red Tide Mitigation and Technology Development Initiative

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-30 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#301 (Y: 112 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20 Chapter No. 2019-114
2019-06-20 Approved by Governor
2019-06-14 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2019-04-30SenateOrdered enrolled
2019-04-30HousePassed; YEAS 112 NAYS 1
2019-04-30HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-29HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-29HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-26HouseReceived
2019-04-26HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/19
2019-04-26HouseReferred to Calendar
2019-04-25HouseIn Messages
2019-04-25SenatePassed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
2019-04-25SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-24SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2019-04-24SenateRead 2nd time
2019-04-22SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/24/19
2019-04-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2019-04-18SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
2019-04-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/18/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2019-04-10SenateNow in Appropriations
2019-04-09SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2019-04-04SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 04/09/19, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2019-03-21SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
2019-03-20SenateFavorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2019-03-15SenateOn Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/20/19, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
2019-02-28SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1135 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1552 (Ch. 2019-114)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3792273Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback