FL S1558 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising the definition of the term "local educational agency" to include certain partners of entities that provide apprenticeship and preapprenticeship programs, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Educational Agencies

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Education
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2020-01-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1025 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in PreK-12 Innovation Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100402Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback