FL S1560 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Environment and Natural Resources
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring that blasting reports be submitted to the Chief Financial Officer and the State Fire Marshal; requiring the Division of State Fire Marshal to make such reports publicly available on its webpage, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Construction Materials Mining Activities

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Environment and Natural Resources
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Environment and Natural Resources; Banking and Insurance; Rules
2020-01-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1431 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
55230Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback