FL S1566 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Decreasing the number of years that licenses to carry concealed weapons or firearms are valid; specifying that experience with a firearm through military service in the Armed Forces of the United States meets the requirement of demonstrating competence with a firearm; requiring that the full set of fingerprints submitted as part of an application for a license be retained by specified entities; requiring the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to bear the licensee's fingerprint retention fee, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concealed Weapons or Firearms Licensing

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Infrastructure and Security
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Infrastructure and Security; Judiciary; Rules
2020-01-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H809 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
79006Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback