FL S1576 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising services required to be provided by charter school sponsors; revising requirements for rules that establish uniform core curricula for state-approved teacher preparation programs; revising requirements relating to annual performance evaluations that educator preparation institutes are required to submit to the Department of Education; revising duties of the department for developing guidelines relating to teacher recruitment and retention, etc.
Title
Education
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Lee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Education, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S7070 (Similar To) 2019-05-10 - Chapter No. 2019-23
H7061 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
H7061 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 33 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1004 | 85 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 59 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 98 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1576 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1576/BillText/Filed/HTML |