FL S1580 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Economic Opportunity to establish a revolving loan guarantee program; requiring the department to contract with an entity meeting certain criteria to administer the program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Minority Businesses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-11SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development
2020-02-11SenateFavorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-02-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/11/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2020-01-13SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Appropriations Subcommittee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic Development; Appropriations
2020-01-08SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1233 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Workforce Development and Tourism Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
288715Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback