FL S1594 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting certain actions to influence a firesafety inspector into violating certain provisions; prohibiting a firesafety inspector from knowingly and willfully accepting an attempt to influence the firesafety inspector into violating certain provisions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Firesafety Inspectors

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-12SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2020-02-12SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2020-02-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-11SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-02-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/20, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2020-01-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1263 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
S1404 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
H1077 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
633217Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback