FL S1616 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-10 - Withdrawn prior to introduction
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Adding the Division of Early Learning to the divisions of the Department of Education; revising the duties of the Early Learning Programs Estimating Conference; providing requirements for minimum child care licensing standards; requiring students enrolled in the Voluntary Prekindergarten Education Program to participate in a specified screening and progress-monitoring program; revising the performance standards for the Voluntary Prekindergarten Education Program; authorizing certain child development programs operating on military installations to participate in the school readiness program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Early Learning and Early Grade Success

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-10SenateWithdrawn prior to introduction
2020-01-09SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1013 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Education
S1636 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7039
S1688 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H7039 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100004Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100103Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100110Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100111Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1001213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1001215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100170Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100222Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100232Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100234Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100236Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100253Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100257Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100259Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100261Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100263Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100267Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100268Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100269Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100271Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100272Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100273Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100277Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100279Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100281Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100283Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100284Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100285Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100288Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100289Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002895Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100291Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100292Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100293Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100294Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002945Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100295Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100296Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100297Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1002995Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1003575Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100701Amended CodeSee Bill Text
10082125Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100825Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100831Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100832Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100833Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101162Amended CodeSee Bill Text
20055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
21208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
216136Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38314Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39604Amended CodeSee Bill Text
391308Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402281Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402305Amended CodeSee Bill Text
402315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40256Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411226Amended CodeSee Bill Text
411227Amended CodeSee Bill Text
414295Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback