FL S1618 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1047
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1047
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating a pilot program within the Division of State Fire Marshal to monitor and report on the use of explosives in construction materials mining activities in Miami-Dade County; requiring the State Fire Marshal to hire or contract with seismologists to monitor and report blasts occurring in connection with construction materials mining activities in Miami-Dade County and to post the reports of the seismologists on the division's website; requiring a person who engages in construction materials mining activities in Miami-Dade County to submit certain written notice relating to the use of an explosive to the State Fire Marshal, etc.
Title
Construction Materials Mining Activities
Sponsors
Sen. Manny Diaz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 1047 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Substituted CS/HB 1047 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Retained on Special Order Calendar |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/20 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/11/20, 2:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Now in Banking and Insurance |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/27/20, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Banking and Insurance; Rules |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1047 (Same As) 2020-09-21 - Chapter No. 2020-180
H1431 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
H1431 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1618 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1618/BillText/Filed/HTML |