FL S1624 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Children and Families, in consultation with the Department of Economic Opportunity, to implement a Temporary Assistance for Needy Families Pay-After-Performance program to provide assistance to certain eligible persons; requiring the department to refer an applicant for temporary cash assistance to the applicable regional workforce board for work registration and orientation; providing requirements for work activities, reporting excused absences, and verification of work hours, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TANF Pay-After-Performance Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1634 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
4140252Amended CodeSee Bill Text
41456Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback