FL S1626 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-02 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Providing conditions under which a proceeding is not substantially justified for purposes of an award under the Florida Equal Access to Justice Act; authorizing certain parties to provide to an agency their understanding of how certain rules apply to specific facts; authorizing the administrative law judge to award attorney fees under certain circumstances; authorizing a party to request mediation of a rule challenge and declaratory statement proceedings, etc.
Title
Administrative Procedures
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Lee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-02 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2014-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/01/14, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2014-03-20 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/25/14, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building --Not Considered |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Introduced |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H0975 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations Committee
S0600 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H1355 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations Committee
S0600 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
H1355 (Similar To) 2014-05-02 - Died in Appropriations Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
120 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 565 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 569 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 57 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 573 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 595 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
120 | 695 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
57 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |