FL S1630 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Clerk of the Supreme Court to use a blind, random selection process to determine venue for certain constitutional challenges under certain circumstances, etc.
Title
Venue for Constitutional Challenges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 4 NAYS 2 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/01/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1630 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1630/BillText/Filed/HTML |