FL S1632 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that the Secretary of State shall be known as "Florida's Chief Arts and Culture Officer"; renaming the Division of Cultural Affairs of the Department of State as the Division of Arts and Culture, etc.
Title
Cultural Affairs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/18/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-12 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Now in Commerce and Tourism |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H757 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 18 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
265 | 283 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
265 | 284 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
265 | 2865 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
265 | 603 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
265 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
265 | 7025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
265 | 704 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
468 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |