FL S1634 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Revising penalties for noncompliance with work requirements for receipt of temporary cash assistance; revising the age of minors who are able to receive child-only benefits during periods of noncompliance with work requirements; requiring the Department of Economic Opportunity, in cooperation with CareerSource Florida, Inc., and the Department of Children and Families, to inform participants in the temporary cash assistance program of work requirements and sanctions and penalties for noncompliance with work requirements, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Assistance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H959 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
H955 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
S1624 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
40282Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409972Amended CodeSee Bill Text
414065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
445024Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback