FL S1644 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the "Florida Instructional Personnel Fair Pay Act" and "Florida Educational Support Employees Fair Pay Act"; requiring the Legislature to fund the Florida Education Finance Program at a level that ensures that instructional personnel and educational support employees earn a living wage; providing for specified percentage increases to the base salaries of instructional personnel and educational support employees for certain years, etc.
Title
Instructional Personnel and Educational Support Employee Salaries
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Education |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1413 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1012 | 053 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1012 | 054 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1644 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1644/BillText/Filed/HTML |