FL S1648 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Defining the term "incapacitated adult child"; specifying that parents are responsible for supporting an incapacitated adult child; requiring certain rights of the parents of an incapacitated adult child to be established in a guardianship proceeding; specifying that a child support order need not terminate on the child's 18th birthday in certain circumstances; providing an additional circumstance under which a guardian advocate must be represented by an attorney in guardianship proceedings, etc.
Title
Support for Incapacitated Adult Children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/04/20, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Appropriations |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H965 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Civil Justice Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
393 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 1255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 31 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
742 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
742 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 1013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 3021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 3201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
744 | 422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1648 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1648/BillText/Filed/HTML |