FL S1658 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creating the Statewide Task Force on Opioid Drug Abuse for a specified purpose; providing for reimbursement of per diem and travel expenses for members; requiring the Department of Legal Affairs to provide the task force with necessary staff; requiring the task force to hold an organizational session before a specified date and quarterly meetings thereafter, etc.
Title
Statewide Task Force on Opioid Drug Abuse
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/04/19, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/18/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H875 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1658 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1658/BillText/Filed/HTML |